Trustees LOWESTOFT AND EAST SUFFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1135624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Martin Lewis Keenan | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
David Pitt | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Linda Rose Kinchenton | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Theodore Reginald Furness | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Margaret Furness | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA KAREN RUSSELL | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Pickess | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV DR Alan Geoffrey Palmer | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Soanes | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Susan Groome | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|||||
CAROL SALLY DAINES | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN ROGERS | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAWN CHRISTINE MARSKELL | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Keith Jackson | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|||||
VALERIE BRENDA HOWLETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
GEOFFREY WILLIAM NAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ROBERT SOANES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TINA ROSE LONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL IRIS DURRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAZEL MARION CATCHPOLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BARRY GIBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV PAM BAYLISS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THELMA WALLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH DURRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA SIGSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELSPETH MACDIARMID MERREN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.