DEVON AREA MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN

Charity number: 1139955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Eden Sharrock Trustee 09 January 2021
UP CLOSE THEATRE Received: On time
Emma Claire Seaman Trustee 09 January 2021 None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Hartog Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
JIM PUTZ Trustee 23 June 2013
NEWTON ABBOT CENTRE ASSOCIATION Received: On time
NEWTON ABBOT AND DISTRICT SOCIETY OF ARTS Received: On time
Frederick John Elford Trustee 09 January 2021
NETWORK OF WELLBEING Received: On time
Raymond Thompson Trustee 08 November 2017 None on record
SUE JOHNS Trustee 12 March 2016 None on record