Accounts and annual returns CALVARY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (PRESTON)

Charity number: 1135901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window