Financial history CALVARY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (PRESTON)

Charity number: 1135901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £196.84k £191.89k £111.59k £149.88k £0
Total expenditure £198.18k £204.55k £120.85k £99.93k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A