BLUE MARINE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TOM APPLEBY Trustee 26 June 2012 None on record
LORD JOHN DEBEN Trustee 26 June 2012 None on record
Sofia Blount Trustee 20 June 2017 None on record
Dr Celine Herweijer Trustee 05 March 2020 None on record
Dr ARLO BRADY Trustee 26 June 2012 None on record
CRAIG DAVIES Trustee 10 January 2013 None on record
PROF CALLUM ROBERTS Trustee 28 June 2012
SEAWEB UK Overdue by 1493 days
CHRIS GORELL BARNES Trustee None on record
LUCY LAKE Trustee 05 March 2020 None on record
GEORGE LINCOLN DUFFIELD Trustee
THE G D CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time