Trustees WEST NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1136177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
61 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Robert Roberts | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Timothy Chaloner MA | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Richman Ncube PhD | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Paul Critchley | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Janice MacQuade | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
David Friswell BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Elspeth Hardy RGN DipICN | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Lesley Evans BSc PGCE | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Elinor Gudgeon | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Mike Wilkinson BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Friswell | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
JOAN GREENING | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
John Cording | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Linda Mary Howling | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Jacqueline Goddard | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Lynne Tonge BTh | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Valerie Fisher | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephanie Howard | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth MacLeod MA MCILIP | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
BARBARA FOSTER | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
LESLEY DENT | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
JOAN CARELESS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
SHEILA JOHNSON BA BSC QTS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
PAULINE SCOTNEY | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
RODDIE M MACLEOD | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID SCOTNEY | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||
REVD G R KERRY DIP HE | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew John Hiles | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||
PHYLLIS BOWMAN | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||
RALPH MICHAEL PERKINS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||
JEAN HARRINGTON | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
C JOHN HOUGHTON | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
JEAN DENNETT BSC | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
HEATHER TITCOMB | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MARY ROSE | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
PHILIP JULIAN BATSTONE | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
FRAUKE ADKINS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
GLENYS REED | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
STEPHEN HARRINGTON | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
ELIZABETH BATSTONE | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
TERRY MARTIN | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
VALERIE SHACKCLOTH | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MAUREEN HIBLING | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN DAVIS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MR D DENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PAULINE ANN DRIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
RUTH HANNAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PETER ALBERT MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MARY ELIZABETH HOUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
WENDY JOY MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
BETTY GUY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DEREK MARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
GILL ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
RAYMOND JOHN WEBB | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JOHN ROSPOPA | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
MRS VYSE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
SUSAN ANNE HILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JANET EILEEN MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
CLIFF SHELTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
STEPHEN CHARLES BLAKIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MRS MAGGIE BLOWERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.