Financial history CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST ROCK OF AGES PARISH

Charity number: 1138577
Charity reporting is up to date (172 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £52.60k £41.51k £33.03k £27.70k £22.45k
Total expenditure £41.96k £43.76k £37.22k £38.10k £20.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A