ST COLUMBA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £270.73k £277.49k £284.97k £283.10k £275.36k
Total expenditure £231.18k £285.77k £284.55k £265.31k £238.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £188.47k £202.17k £189.36k N/A
Income from government grants £190.69k £0 N/A N/A £215.16k