ST COLUMBA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Uden Revd Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
JOHN RICHARD CHAPLIN Trustee None on record
VERONICA MARY MCDOUALL Trustee None on record
Asha Praseedom Trustee 05 June 2018 None on record
Helen Christy Trustee 16 December 2015 None on record
JENNIFER JACOBSBERG Trustee 12 November 2011 None on record
Helen Bull Trustee 03 September 2019 None on record
Dr Tim Sharp Trustee 05 June 2018 None on record
Ann Hughes Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record