Trustees 59TH NEWCHAPEL SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1125807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Hawthorne Chair 05 April 2012
None on record
Suzanne Meakin Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
Andrew Swain Trustee 17 March 2017
None on record
David Turrell Trustee 01 July 2012
None on record
Catherine Hancock Trustee 01 April 2005
None on record