Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BIRMINGHAM PARISH CHURCH (ST. MARTIN IN THE BULL RING)
Charity number: 1127338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Berthan WOLF | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nellie Gerighty | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Soteroula Kanari | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Marie Bennett | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Murgatroyd | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorretta Lamara Jones | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ivor David Eugene Lewis | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew John Churchouse | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jeremy Robert Allcock | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin James Walker | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|||||
John Gerighty | Trustee | 23 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Margaret Elizabeth Jepson | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEAN JEPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN BLAIR-CHAPPELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS M F WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ELSIE BLAIR-CHAPPELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.