Trustees THE ASSOCIATION OF ENGLISH CATHEDRALS

Charity number: 1128254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Very Rev'd Jo Kelly-Moore Chair 19 May 2022
None on record
Emily Charlotte MacKenzie Trustee 16 November 2022
CATHEDRALS' WORKSHOP FELLOWSHIP
Recently registered
THE CATHEDRALS ADMINISTRATION AND FINANCE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Very Rev'd Nicholas Charles Papadopulos Trustee 19 May 2022
THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
SOUTHERN CATHEDRALS FESTIVAL SOCIETY
Overdue by 88 days
THE HARNHAM WATER MEADOWS TRUST
Received: On time
THE SALISBURY CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE MAGNA CARTA TRUST FOR SALISBURY CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
Jonathan Graham Ward Trustee 19 May 2022
THE FRIENDS OF ST JAMES' CHURCH HAMSTERLEY, COUNTY DURHAM
Overdue by 27 days
Anna Victoria Pitt Trustee 13 May 2022
THE FRIENDS OF BIRMINGHAM CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
THE CATHEDRALS ADMINISTRATION AND FINANCE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SUTTON COLDFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Simon Mark Griffiths Trustee 02 February 2022
THE FRIENDS OF TRURO CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
STEWART AND HILDA JENKINS THANKSGIVING FUND
Received: On time
THE PEDLER BURSARY
Received: On time
Rev Matthew James Vernon Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
Very Rev'd David Robert Malvern Monteith Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Rev Aidan Stephen George Platten Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
David Robert Bilton Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
THE VERY REVEREND ROGERS MORGAN GOVENDER Trustee 14 June 2016
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Overdue by 27 days
THE DEAN OF MANCHESTER CROSLAND FUND
Received: On time
THE MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL VISITOR CENTRE
Overdue by 27 days
WE STAND TOGETHER
Received: 4 days late
BISHOP LEE'S SCHOLARSHIP
Received: On time
CATHERINE RICHARDS CHARITY OR STRANGEWAYS WIDOW'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev PETER HOWELL-JONES Trustee 17 June 2014
LIVESEY'S EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
MEDIC MALAWI
Received: On time
MEDIC MALAWI
Recently registered
BLACKBURN CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BLACKBURN DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE PEEL FOUNDATION SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
THE PILLING TRUST FUND
Received: On time