Accounts and annual returns NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1127637
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 July 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 July 2021 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 August 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 August 2020 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 December 2019 173 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 12 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window