Financial history NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1127637
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £250.13k £334.90k £344.16k £355.53k £362.00k
Total expenditure £291.27k £293.94k £357.33k £357.33k £336.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A