Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WOMBOURNE
Charity number: 1128061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon James Keeling | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Green | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Shirley Welch | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Hill | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
LAURA PARRY | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY EPTON | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN ROBERTS | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN STEPHEN BRAIN | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
OLWYN LUCINDA GRAINGER | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Parker | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Moore | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
TERESA JOAN GUEST | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JOHN BRYANT | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROY WOOTTON | Trustee | 07 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JAMES GARRINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY WALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DAVID CRATHORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NIGEL CHARLES CUNNINGHAM WELCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR LAURIE GAINER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE FREEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.