ANN MUFF'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 500073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £5.88k £5.50k £23.69k £6.41k £6.19k
Total expenditure £3.65k £11.17k £18.90k £3.69k £8.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A