Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE ECCLESTON
Charity number: 1127818
Charity reporting is up to date (149 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gareth Richard Banton | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Paul Kelly | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Kathryn Kelly | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Marie Grant | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jean Moore | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Coffey | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Doreen Rose | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Keith Robert Lancaster | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter Christopher Anderson | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MISS ANNE HAYES B.A. HONS (MIDWIFERY) | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORNA MARGARET ANNE LLEWELLYN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANE LISBETH WRIGHT BSC, PGCE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.