ST GILBERT'S PTA

Charity number: 1128751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £7.64k £8.78k £12.08k £10.51k £10.11k
Total expenditure £5.23k £2.25k £5.19k £4.40k £9.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A