Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, FOUR OAKS, SUTTON COLDFIELD
Charity number: 1127355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Murray East | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Kent | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Hurley | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Rita Cox | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Saunders | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Neil Gibson | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE TIMMINS | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Louise Margaret Richmond | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Blundell ACIB | Trustee | 31 December 2008 |
|
|
||||
ROSAMUND JANE DOUGLAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GEORGE PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMY DOROTHY RUSSELL C.of Educ. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DEREK LIMBERT BSC MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER ANN BLUNDELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA MARGARET LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.