THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAWRENCE'S, HATFIELD

Charity number: 1127942
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £64.29k £72.68k £70.90k £77.72k £92.82k
Total expenditure £71.92k £61.70k £83.13k £70.63k £91.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £536 N/A N/A £3.50k