THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH ST GILES & ST NICHOLAS

Charity number: 1128390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 April 2017 On time Download