THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH ST GILES & ST NICHOLAS

Charity number: 1128390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £306.67k £275.66k £297.92k £267.31k £181.28k
Total expenditure £304.49k £221.95k £242.42k £351.54k £226.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £22.70k £32