THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH ST GILES & ST NICHOLAS

Charity number: 1128390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Matthew Robert Selman Chair 23 October 2020 None on record
Dr Peter John Stuart Wilton Trustee 23 October 2020 None on record
PAULINE MARY WADE Trustee 24 April 2015 None on record
Heather Barbara Knight Trustee 23 October 2020 None on record
Alan Clarke Trustee 27 April 2018
THE SID VALE ASSOCIATION CIO Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH Received: On time
Cynthia Kay Wood Trustee 23 October 2020 None on record
Gerard David Shattock Trustee 12 May 2021 None on record
Dame Julia Mary Slingo Trustee 26 April 2019 None on record
Michael James Ellingham Trustee 12 May 2021
THE FRIENDS OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH Received: On time
FELICITY WILSON-RUDD Trustee 28 April 2017 None on record
Merrill Ann Millington Trustee 23 October 2020 None on record
Alison Jayne Budgell Trustee 26 April 2019 None on record
Dr PETER JOHN BYRD Trustee 24 April 2015 None on record
Lesley Sophia Thompson Trustee 23 October 2020 None on record
Dr Jennie Golding Trustee 08 August 2012
MATHEMATICS EDUCATION TO EMPOWER AFRICA
THE JOINT MATHEMATICAL COUNCIL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM Received: On time
STEPHANIE JESSICA HOLMAN Trustee 05 May 2011 None on record