Accounts and annual returns MINYMA

Charity number: 1127771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 11 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 19 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required