Trustees ELBURTON METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1128726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martha Wright | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Ridley | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Julie Gray | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Gow | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth John Ridley | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Carlyon | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Darren Middleton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
John Fox | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Derick Merrifield | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Joan Batchelor | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS CLOOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA MARY HADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANNE COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV DAVID ERNEST YOUNGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN JANE CARHART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET CONSTANCE PASSMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mrs Jenny Weymouth | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN MARGARET DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE JUDITH AVENT | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRENDA ANNE YOUNGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY JAMES SLEEP | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.