Trustees ORPINGTON METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1129331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Selvakumar R Nambinarayanan | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Maddy | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Franklyn Brew | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neville John Secular | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon David Laurence Jones | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|||||
LOIS CLAIRE EAST | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorrance Palmer | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Victor Stewart | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robin Charles Licence | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Margaret Barnes | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Pedley | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH HICKEY | Trustee | 25 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE BARBARA BOSWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER ALAN LANCASTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH DOBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET HALEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
Christopher John Price | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELIZABETH IRENE WELLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRENE FRANCES COTTERELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA CAROL EILEEN WILLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLYN ANNE LICENCE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.