Trustees GUILDFORD METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1127643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP ERNEST HANCOCK | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Paul Stuart Glass BA,MA,PhD | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Annika Mathews | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Pamela Mary Palmer | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Alwyn Marriage | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
Michael John David Bishop | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|||||||
JAN HANCOCK | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|||||||
MICHAEL LEE | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PROMILA SKELTON | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JANUS EILEEN SMITH | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ROSEMARY LEE | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
PETER ERIC YOUNGS | Trustee | 20 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Dr EDWIN BRUCE FARMER CBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARGARET BIRCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BERYL ANN FARMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROSAMUND TREMBATH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
David Charles Birch | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Andrea Jean Campion-Smith | Trustee |
|
||||||||
NIGEL CAMPION-SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr SUSAN ELIZABETH SNASHALL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.