Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, ROBY
Charity number: 1131572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kate Elizabeth Wharton | Chair | 25 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Craig Peter Reardon | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Margaret Barker | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Edwin Gerard Rodgers | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Smith | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Murphy | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Deyes | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Newton | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Aldridge | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leah Elizabeth Daly | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jaime Salcido Negrete | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie McDonald | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sian Barker | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richard Enescott | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Sheehan | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANNE VERRYCKE | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Florence Page | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNN STANDISH | Trustee | 27 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Armstrong | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.