Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEWBURY ST NICOLAS

Charity number: 1128145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £826.05k £601.91k £464.94k £459.03k £480.68k
Total expenditure £583.46k £617.25k £510.55k £463.33k £451.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £89.91k £5.21k N/A £3.04k £1.63k
Income - Donations and legacies £768.88k £550.86k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £31.98k £26.05k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £24.73k £11.08k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £466 £2.02k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £11.89k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £229.94k £4.11k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £571.17k £592.06k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.28k £25.19k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.97k £4.92k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £26.50k £50.28k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A