Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEWBURY ST NICOLAS

Charity number: 1128145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV WILL HUNTER SMART Chair 05 June 2011
THE MAJENDIE CHARITY FOR THE POOR OF SPEEN
Received: On time
Christopher ORTIZ Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Suzanne Emma Lees Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Tristan Rory Lloyd Davies Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Joanna Angeline Lazarus Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Peter Euart Bradley Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Richard John Walker Coward Trustee 25 November 2020
COUNT EVERYONE IN
Received: On time
Rev Jacqueline Fountain Trustee 05 July 2020
None on record
Rev Janice Macdonald Trustee 10 October 2019
None on record
Christine Vivien Philip Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
Tania Corrie Wolak Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
Andrew Laidler Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
PHILIP STEPHEN JAMES DAVIS Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
SAMANTHA MULLENDER Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Helen Dean Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
Rev JOY MARIA MAWDESLEY Trustee 09 July 2016
None on record
JONATHAN EDWARD SOUTH Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
JAMES LANCASTER ACMA CGMA Trustee 03 November 2015
None on record
KATHRYN REBECCA BIRD Trustee 28 April 2015
None on record
CHRISTOPHER SIMON JOHN DAVIS Trustee 28 April 2015
None on record
SHARON JOY COWARD Trustee 09 September 2013
None on record
MARK WYNDHAM KNIGHT Trustee 08 September 2013
None on record
GRAHAM COLIN CASKIE Trustee 31 May 2012
None on record
VIVIEN GRACE STAUNTON Trustee 03 May 2012
FRIENDS OF HOPE FOR AFRICA MISSIONS
Received: On time
NIGEL CRISPIAN FREEMAN Trustee
None on record