THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. EUSTACHIUS, TAVISTOCK

Charity number: 1130516
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £1.00k
Other income £184.82k £197.07k £206.28k £224.42k £291.07k
Total expenditure £213.81k £218.77k £239.90k £283.33k £200.92k