THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANNE, AIGBURTH

Charity number: 1128483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Simon Trustee 26 November 2020 None on record
DONNA ELIZABETH BRANCH Trustee None on record
Rev Michael Gary Ferguson Trustee 18 April 2021 None on record
PAUL ROBERTS Trustee 27 April 2015 None on record
JOHN JOSEPH BROWN B Sc Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
JAN CRANE Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
MARGARET PARRY Trustee None on record
Robert John Wallace Trustee 24 January 2019 None on record
DAVID HENRY BRUFFELL Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
MRS P. KNOWLES Trustee None on record
REV IAN RICHARD GREENWOOD B Ed Trustee 28 June 2013 None on record
John Millington Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
JACKY EVANS Trustee None on record
Paul Leslie O'Brien Trustee 28 September 2019 None on record
NIKKI CUNNINGHAM Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
MARTIN LOVGREEN Trustee None on record
IAN STEWART CROWE Trustee
LIVERPOOL SOUTH DEANERY Received: On time
Rosa Dover BA, MBA. Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
GILL JONES Trustee None on record
Julie Mangan CSS, MA Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record