Trustees MAWDESLEY AND NEIGHBOURING VILLAGES UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)
Charity number: 1128556

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Ralph Jolley | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Gerard Farrell | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Mary Murphy | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Baker | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Clarke | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Southworth | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Kirkman | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Doyle | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Molyneux | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janice Mary Parr | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth Gornell | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Williams | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger William Darling | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pat Bright | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Jones | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.