Trustees HINCKLEY METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1128202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Parkins | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Patricia Mukorombindo | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
CYNTHIA JORDAN | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE CLINTON | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sue Cooper | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||
MARIANNE DUFFY | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK HARTSHORN | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Richard Charles Smith | Trustee |
|
||||||
Gwendolen Jill Coley | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN FRANK GODDARD FSCA | Trustee |
|
||||||
RUTH PEACH CERT ED | Trustee |
|
||||||
RACHEL COBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN ROY VINCENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET PEARCE BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE MARY GODDARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN A MIDDLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RONALD JAMES PILLANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EMMA BASSFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER LUCAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE ANNE SPENCER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES EDWARD DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.