THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.AUGUSTINES, GILLINGHAM, KENT

Charity number: 1128481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time Download