ST ANDREW'S METHODIST CHURCH WORCESTER

Charity number: 1128272
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £80.39k £98.23k £111.12k £88.27k £62.87k
Total expenditure £68.53k £123.23k £93.49k £83.29k £94.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A