Financial history THE STEVE SINNOTT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1130814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £186.47k £175.96k £220.08k £176.49k £182.97k
Total expenditure £161.26k £151.02k £146.62k £228.01k £161.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A