Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN-AT-HAMPSTEAD
Charity number: 1129264

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Wigley Evans | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Dr Jessica Harland | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Graham Stuart Dunn | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
SHEENA GINNINGS | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
HAGAR CLIFF | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Sarah Cheriton-Jones | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
DEBORAH ZANDSTRA | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
JEAN HARRISON | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
John Barker | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Jonathan Charles Siddall | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Jonathan Michael Davey | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
REV JAN RUSHTON | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
ELIZABETH JANE BEESLEY | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
NICHOLAS MARTIN WALSER | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Inigo Rodney Milman Woolf | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||
Dr HANDLEY MICHAEL GAMBRELL STEVENS MA, PhD | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||
ANGELA MARY GARDNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
GAYNOR ANTHIGA BASSEY-FISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
Vanessa Fitzpatrick | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
ROSEMARY ANNE LOYD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.