VINEYARD COMMUNITY CHURCH, DAVENTRY

Charity number: 1128805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £58.13k £40.32k £45.77k £37.15k £40.56k
Total expenditure £54.67k £49.44k £35.39k £40.10k £29.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A