Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, FULHAM
Charity number: 1130273
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Owen Louis Caffrey Toller | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Rowan Young | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Morine Tomlinson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Anne Saunders | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek MacRae | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Cox BA MA QTS | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Josephine Burton | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donald Mckenzie Johnson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Patrick Dean | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vernon William Burgess MCILIP | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Emily Jane Richardson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Charles Stewart Ritchie | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Michael McCarroll | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Lusmore | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Victoria Northridge | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Robert Henry Fryer | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Peter Quy | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Frances Ruby Tweed-Clarke SRN | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nunnerley Hall | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Christopher George Cyril Meyrick | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
LAURA AUCKLAND | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY TWEEDIE | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev PENELOPE ANNE SEABROOK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.