Trustees CALDERDALE WELLBEING
Charity number: 1132316
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Firth Hunt | Chair | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynnette Frances Cassidy | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Sharman | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Claire Turner | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Morrish | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Naomi Sutcliffe | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lydia May Blundell | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carla Jayne Harrison | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNY FAGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.