Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, NEW MILVERTON
Charity number: 1128485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Leighton Thomas | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hill | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Evans | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cooper | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Lee | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Griffin-Booth | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lockyer | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lee | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Watt | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marie Calvert | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Mary McEvoy | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy William James Clack | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew McArthur | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marcella Ruth Bosanquet King | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN CALVERT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.