Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DARTMOUTH

Charity number: 1129018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Andrew Langley Chair 09 May 2021
None on record
Edna McGregor Trustee 09 December 2021
None on record
Charles Deuchar Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Margaret Probyn Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Henry Franks Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Julia Springett Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Ernest William Wingeatt Trustee 27 April 2014
CHURCH LANDS FOR THE CHURCH OF TOWNSTAL ST CLEMENT
Received: On time
THE PARISH OF DARTMOUTH CHARITIES
Received: On time
Howard O'Keeffe Trustee 14 August 2013
THE ECCLESIASTICAL SHARE OF THE DARTMOUTH TRUST
Received: On time
DART VALLEY U3A
Received: On time
Shelia Boswell Trustee
CHURCH LANDS FOR THE CHURCH OF TOWNSTAL ST CLEMENT
Received: On time
THE PARISH OF DARTMOUTH CHARITIES
Received: On time
Susan Mary Black Trustee
THE ECCLESIASTICAL SHARE OF THE DARTMOUTH TRUST
Received: On time
Colin Cooper Trustee
THE ECCLESIASTICAL SHARE OF THE DARTMOUTH TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher Joseph Alexander Helyer Trustee
None on record
Wendy Ann Rendle Trustee
None on record