Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER WOOLTON
Charity number: 1132014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GEORGE KURUVILLA | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Whitaker | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Vinter | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hazledine | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Dulley | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Paisley | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Edward Thwaite | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Farmer | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Griffiths | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas William Canty | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norma Marion Winsland | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Welsby | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Nicholas Butler | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Whitaker | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian McColl | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katie Daly | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lynne Roberts | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan West | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|||||
David Harrison | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Lee | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Dottie | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY MAY BAKER | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Valerie Craig | Trustee | 29 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.