CREATIVE HANDS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 March 2018 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 September 2016 On time Download