Trustees MICKLEOVER METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1128907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Rhys Owen | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Stuart Bell | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
ADAM McLOUGHLIN | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARY MORGAN | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE ELAINE WOODCOCK | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
IAN CLARK | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BAGWORTH | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|||||
MARGARET CLARK | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Tristram | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ALEXANDER MORGAN | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vivien RICHARD | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JOAN VINCENT | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND JOHN FOREY ACMA | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Angela Gloria Forey | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARION PATMORE | Trustee | 28 July 2011 |
|
|||||
PHILIP ANDREW ROYLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS SUE ATHERTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DOT THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY LEVITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MERYL EVELYN SPRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARILYN ELIZABETH ANNE BAGWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
John Spray | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.