Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEDNESFORD
Charity number: 1128668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PAUL KELLY | Chair | 11 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Linda Mary O'Brien | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry John Wainwright | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr CARON MARGARET THOMAS D H Sc | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANNE JENKINS | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
GRANVILLE HENDERSON | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES MAXFIELD | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TINA HENDERSON | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHARON DENISE JAGGER | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MAURICE JAMES MARTIN | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE RICHARDS | Trustee | 13 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Elisabeth Kelly | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elise Martin | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
EMMA CARDINAL | Trustee | 03 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWINA JANE LANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYNMOR WILLIAM WELLINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.