COMMUNITY LAW SERVICE(NORTHAMPTON AND COUNTY)

Charity number: 1128718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.26m £1.20m £1.03m £1.27m £1.24m
Total expenditure £1.27m £1.20m £1.06m £1.27m £1.28m
Income from government contracts £387.51k £123.97k £152.09k £148.09k £154.91k
Income from government grants £366.30k £385.15k £378.80k £177.57k £360.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.37k £3.79k £2.96k £3.08k £3.24k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.24m £1.18m £1.01m £1.25m £1.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £541 £89 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £17.43k £8.51k £14.20k £17.00k £15.04k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.27m £1.20m £1.06m £1.27m £1.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.95k £4.37k £4.45k £6.29k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0