Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL HALLOWS BY THE TOWER WITH ST. DUNSTAN'S IN THE EAST, LONDON

Charity number: 1129137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Katherine Jane Hedderly Chair 03 April 2019
None on record
Rev Jennifer Eileen Midgley-Adam Trustee 14 July 2022
None on record
Martin Graham Carr Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Robert Stephen Charles Stichbury Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Anne Palmer Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Robin Moore Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Szabina Soptei Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Howard Neil Redgwell Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
DR Siobhan Martin PhD Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Rev Sophia Caroline Annabel Acland Trustee 01 September 2015
STROUD DISTRICT FOODBANK CIO
Received: On time
DIANA MARY ROBERTSHAW Trustee
TOC H AND ALL HALLOWS TRUST
Received: On time
KENNETH LESLIE MARSHALL Trustee
ST DUNSTAN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CATHERINE ELIZABETH PRICE Trustee
None on record