Financial history RASPBERRY PI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.27m £9.47m £31.45m £45.79m £95.82m
Total expenditure £2.83m £4.76m £27.89m £44.21m £88.72m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £421.03k £3.52m £3.41m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £683.31k £2.31m £2.31m £1.83m £1.63m
Income - Other trading activities £16.71m £25.46m £27.94m £39.56m £71.44m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £130.69k £289.82k £432.35k £542.20k £403.18k
Income - Other £39.08k £86.28k £768.46k £3.85m £22.34m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.83m £5.12m £7.70m £10.00m £9.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.11k £15.61m £20.19m £34.20m £79.23m
Expenditure - Governance £38.49k £28.60k £46.15k £73.71k £79.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £6.11k £15.70k £844 £8.82k £6.78k
Expenditure - Other £7.65m £15.70k £844 £0 £0